# Multiplication By 5, 25 And 125

## Multiplication Of 5 With Any Number

Let’s understand this rule by taking examples. All you have to do is write 5 as 10/2 since 10 divided by 2 is 5

49*5 = 49*10/2 = 490/2 = 245

453*5 = 453*10/2 = 4530/2 = 2265

**Multiplication Of 25 With Any Number**

Convert 25 to 100/4. 100/4 is another way of writing 25. Let’s understand this rule by taking examples:

67*25 = 67*100/4 = 6700/4 = 1675

298*25 = 298*100/4 = 29800/4 = 7450

## Multiplication Of 125 With Any Number

To multiply 125 with any number, convert 125 into 1000/8 which is another way of representing 125. 1000/8 is 125

Let’s understand this rule by taking examples:

93*125 = 93*1000/8 = 93000/8 = 11625

137*125 = 137*1000/8 = 137000/8 = 17125